NY A01039 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - substituted by s396a
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - substituted by s396a
Summary
Provides for the city of Albany to adopt a pilot residential parking permit system within certain areas of the city.
Title
Authorizes the city of Albany, by adoption of a local law or ordinance, to provide for a residential parking permit system in such city within three-quarters of a mile radius of the Nelson A. Rockefeller Empire State Plaza.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | substituted by s396a | |
2010-06-29 | rules report cal.425 | |
2010-06-29 | reported | |
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-14 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-05-11 | print number 1039a | |
2010-05-11 | amend and recommit to transportation | |
2010-01-06 | referred to transportation | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.727 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S396 | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | home rule request | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.580 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-09 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-07 | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00396 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1039
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01039&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |