NY A01039 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - print number 1039a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - print number 1039a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the well water and water supply education act; requires the department of health to establish and maintain a public education program on the potential hazards of private water supplies; requires home inspectors, licensed real estate agents and brokers to provide private water supply education materials to prospective buyers of property where such property is serviced by a private water supply.
Title
Creates the well water and water supply education act; requires the department of health to establish and maintain a public education program on the potential hazards of private water supplies; requires home inspectors, licensed real estate agents and brokers to provide private water supply education materials to prospective buyers of property where such property is serviced by a private water supply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | print number 1039a |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |