NY A01051 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 1051a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 1051a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Title
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1051a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.49 |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.52 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01145 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1145A