NY A01084 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rights of residents of adult care facilities; provides that residents have a right to be informed about their condition, treatment and medications.
Title
Relates to rights of residents of adult care facilities; provides that residents have a right to be informed about their condition, treatment and medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | approval memo.37 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | signed chap.646 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.618 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S874 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.36 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00874 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37