NY A01108 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s2680a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of campaign funds for childcare expenses where they are incurred in the campaign or in the execution of the duties of public office or party position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the use of campaign funds for childcare expenses where they are incurred in the campaign or in the execution of the duties of public office or party position.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s2680a
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.486
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.486
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 1108b
2019-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to election law
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 1108a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to election law
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02680 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.136

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01108
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01108A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01108B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01108&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback