NY A01118 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5221a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5221a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the creation of a reference list of businesses that provide locator technology designed to assist in the expedited location of individuals afflicted with Alzheimer's disease or dementia who become lost or disoriented.
Title
Mandates the creation of a reference list of businesses that provide locator technology designed to assist in the expedited location of individuals afflicted with Alzheimer's disease or dementia who become lost or disoriented.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5221a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.401 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.401 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 1118a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S05221 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.310