NY A01120 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provision of patient health information and medical records; expands the definition of medical records to include all health related records; prohibits fees for providing certain records.
Title
Relates to provision of patient health information and medical records; expands the definition of medical records to include all health related records; prohibits fees for providing certain records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.52 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.379 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05243 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH