NY A01124 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that health care decisions regarding routine medical treatment for adult patients without surrogates are not required to be reviewed by an ethics committee.
Title
Provides that health care decisions regarding routine medical treatment for adult patients without surrogates are not required to be reviewed by an ethics committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.622 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1452 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6356 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.221 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06356 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622