NY A01130 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the health department's review of correctional health services.
Title
Expands the health department's review of correctional health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.155 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.636 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a1130a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1751 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1073A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1073a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.636 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 1130a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01073 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.155