NY A01148 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.
Title
Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.55 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.23 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01856 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH