NY A01149 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that a practitioner is a physician who is authorized to prescribe controlled substances.
Title
Establishes that a practitioner is a physician who is authorized to prescribe controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.335 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02056 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH