NY A01149 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no person shall be discriminated in his or her civil rights because of sex.
Title
Provides that no person shall be discriminated in his or her civil rights because of sex.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |