NY A01155 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that real property assessment challenges shall be served upon a fire district by serving the chair of the board of fire commissioners of the fire district.
Title
Provides that real property assessment challenges shall be served upon a fire district by serving the chair of the board of fire commissioners of the fire district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.53 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.176 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01107 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT