NY A01167 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to mandatory anti-arson applications for insurance coverage to insure any building against the peril of fire or explosion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions relating to mandatory anti-arson applications for insurance coverage to insure any building against the peril of fire or explosion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.380
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S05126 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback