NY A01184 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory reporting of certain convictions, professional misconduct and/or employment termination; defines terms; further requires all licensees to report to the education department any conviction of a crime in any jurisdiction within thirty days after the entry of a judgment of conviction; authorizes the commissioner or deputy commissioner for the professions to issue a summary suspension order under certain circumstances; further authorizes the district attorney to give written notice to the department of education upon the conviction of a felony or misdemeanor of any person holding a license pursuant to title eight of the education law; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires mandatory reporting of certain convictions, professional misconduct and/or employment termination; defines terms; further requires all licensees to report to the education department any conviction of a crime in any jurisdiction within thirty days after the entry of a judgment of conviction; authorizes the commissioner or deputy commissioner for the professions to issue a summary suspension order under certain circumstances; further authorizes the district attorney to give written notice to the department of education upon the conviction of a felony or misdemeanor of any person holding a license pursuant to title eight of the education law; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Sen. Mark Walczyk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 1184a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.58 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.381 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06240 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6240A