NY A01193 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the determination of overpayment recovery amounts for health care providers; provides certain requirements be met when the process known as extrapolation will be used.
Title
Relates to the determination of overpayment recovery amounts for health care providers; provides certain requirements be met when the process known as extrapolation will be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.55 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.119 |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02303 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE