NY A01193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-26)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Sponsors

Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Kieran Lalor [R]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]
Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. William Barclay [R]Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Daniel Stec [R]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Mary Walsh [R]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.153
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.153
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-07-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 1193c
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 1193b
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 1193a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04035 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4035A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1193
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01193
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01193A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01193B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01193C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback