NY A01194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - print number 1194a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the well water and water supply education act; requires the department of health to establish and maintain a public education program on the potential hazards of private water supplies; requires home inspectors, licensed real estate agents and brokers to provide private water supply education materials to prospective buyers of property where such property is serviced by a private water supply and contact information for relevant local health organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the well water and water supply education act; requires the department of health to establish and maintain a public education program on the potential hazards of private water supplies; requires home inspectors, licensed real estate agents and brokers to provide private water supply education materials to prospective buyers of property where such property is serviced by a private water supply and contact information for relevant local health organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyprint number 1194a
2019-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01845 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1845A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback