NY A01211 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any person charged with enforcing laws prohibiting cruelty to animals shall cause a report to be made when, in the performance of his or her duties, such person has reasonable cause to believe that abuse or maltreatment of a child has also occurred; also provides that a person charged with the responsibility of filing a report of child abuse or maltreatment shall also file a report of suspected animal cruelty.
Title
Provides that any person charged with enforcing laws prohibiting cruelty to animals shall cause a report to be made when, in the performance of his or her duties, such person has reasonable cause to believe that abuse or maltreatment of a child has also occurred; also provides that a person charged with the responsibility of filing a report of child abuse or maltreatment shall also file a report of suspected animal cruelty.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | print number 1211a |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S03415 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to children and families