NY A01213 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - signed chap.242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to access to foreign state records concerning previous or present mental illness of applicants for firearms licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to access to foreign state records concerning previous or present mental illness of applicants for firearms licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-03Senatesigned chap.242
2019-09-03Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-29SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-29Senate3RD READING CAL.90
2019-01-29SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2438
2019-01-29SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-01-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.17
2019-01-28Assemblyrules report cal.17
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02438 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1213

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01213&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01213&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01213
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01213&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01213&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1213#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01213&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback