NY A01219 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits inclusion of non-disclosure agreements in settlements of hydraulic fracturing actions when there is evidence of threat to public health or safety.
Title
Prohibits inclusion of non-disclosure agreements in settlements of hydraulic fracturing actions when there is evidence of threat to public health or safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.61 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.222 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |