NY A01261 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-7)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to hours, wages and supplements in contracts for public work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to hours, wages and supplements in contracts for public work.

Sponsors

Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]
Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.101
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S01947 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - REFERRED TO LABOR

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback