NY A01265 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the New York state thruway authority to provide a discounted toll rate to farmers transporting agricultural products.
Title
Allows the New York state thruway authority to provide a discounted toll rate to farmers transporting agricultural products.
Sponsors
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Sen. Mark Walczyk [R] |
Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | print number 1265a |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02787 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2787A