NY A01267 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading 1267d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading 1267d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a uniform process for considering applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives.
Title
Requires a uniform process for considering applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1267d |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.63 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1267c |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.237 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1267b |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1267a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06408 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6408B