NY A01282 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.
Title
Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | print number 1282a |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00594 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY