NY A01303 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5532b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s5532b
2019-06-03Assemblyamended on third reading 1303b
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.476
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-22Assemblyprint number 1303a
2019-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S05532 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01303
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01303A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01303B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01303&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback