NY A01313 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a private right of action for unconsented removal or tampering with a sexually protective device.
Title
Relates to creating a private right of action for unconsented removal or tampering with a sexually protective device.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.459 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | print number 1313c |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1313b |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 1313a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04400 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 4400C