NY A01320 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if the board of elections determines that a person was entitled to vote it shall cast and canvass such ballot if such board finds that the voter substantially complied with the requirements of the election law; failure to provide previous address not deemed a fatal defect and ballot cast and counted.
Title
Provides that if the board of elections determines that a person was entitled to vote it shall cast and canvass such ballot if such board finds that the voter substantially complied with the requirements of the election law; failure to provide previous address not deemed a fatal defect and ballot cast and counted.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.64 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.717 |
2019-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.711 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3045B |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.95 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.95 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1320a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03045 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.64