NY A01320 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers and volunteer emergency medical personnel under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers and volunteer emergency medical personnel under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | print number 1320a |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02245 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S03989 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S03989 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE