NY A01345 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Title
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.200 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4940 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.290 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04940 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1345