NY A01345 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to town elections and permissive referendums.
Title
Relates to town elections and permissive referendums.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.91 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.179 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01368 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT