NY A01355 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the intent of the legislature to generally defer to parental choices regarding the care, custody and control of their children; mandates that the death of a parent shall be a factor when considering a grandparent's standing to receive visitation or custody; directs that costs be payable by an unsuccessful petitioner where a contest was brought in bad faith.
Title
Establishes the intent of the legislature to generally defer to parental choices regarding the care, custody and control of their children; mandates that the death of a parent shall be a factor when considering a grandparent's standing to receive visitation or custody; directs that costs be payable by an unsuccessful petitioner where a contest was brought in bad faith.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02165 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES