NY A01364 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders of adjournment in contemplation of dismissal by mandating that judges seal certain records of defendants rather than giving judges discretion for such an action; and limits the total period of adjournment to 90 days.
Title
Relates to orders of adjournment in contemplation of dismissal by mandating that judges seal certain records of defendants rather than giving judges discretion for such an action; and limits the total period of adjournment to 90 days.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.71 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.277 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02278 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES