NY A01369 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.269
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1549
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3688A
2018-05-30SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.942
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-05-09Assemblyprint number 1369a
2018-05-09Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-01-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S03688 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1369A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01369&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01369&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01369
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01369&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01369A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01369&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01369&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1369#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback