NY A01398 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the development and creation of distributed ledger technology, which is a mathematically secured, chronological, and decentralized consensus ledger or database, whether maintained via internet interaction, peer-to-peer network, or otherwise used to authenticate, record, share and synchronize transactions in their respective electronic ledgers or databases, and business entities that develop distributed ledger technology.
Title
Relates to the development and creation of distributed ledger technology, which is a mathematically secured, chronological, and decentralized consensus ledger or database, whether maintained via internet interaction, peer-to-peer network, or otherwise used to authenticate, record, share and synchronize transactions in their respective electronic ledgers or databases, and business entities that develop distributed ledger technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 1398a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06037 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - referred to ways and means