NY A01428 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to abolishing positions occupied by public employees absent on military duty; mandates compliance with the Federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994; prohibits abolition of positions based solely upon the fact that the positions are filled by individuals engaged in military duty.
Title
Relates to abolishing positions occupied by public employees absent on military duty; mandates compliance with the Federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994; prohibits abolition of positions based solely upon the fact that the positions are filled by individuals engaged in military duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Senate | signed chap.152 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1107 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4583A |
2011-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1428b |
2011-04-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.177 |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | print number 1428a |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-01-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04583 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1428B