NY A01428 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the permanent disqualification of school bus drivers who fail a random alcohol or drug test in certain cases, under the code of federal regulations, where they have previously failed such test or met comparable criteria.
Title
Provides for the permanent disqualification of school bus drivers who fail a random alcohol or drug test in certain cases, under the code of federal regulations, where they have previously failed such test or met comparable criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |