NY A01434 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.914
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6111A
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.478
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 1434b
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-05Assemblyprint number 1434a
2019-02-05Assemblyamend and recommit to agriculture
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S06111 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1434B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01434
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01434A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01434B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01434&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback