NY A01458 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - substituted by s7222
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - substituted by s7222
Summary
Requires the board of elections in the city of New York to maintain a voting machine storage and preparation facility in each borough of the city.
Title
An act to amend the election law, in relation to maintenance requirements for the board of elections in the city of New York
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | substituted by s7222 | |
2010-05-27 | advanced to third reading cal.942 | |
2010-05-24 | reported | |
2010-02-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to election law | |
2009-04-09 | advanced to third reading cal.309 | |
2009-04-06 | reported | |
2009-03-11 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S7222 (Same As) 2010-09-18 - VETOED MEMO.6816
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01458&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |