NY A01466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that farmers shall receive an exemption from tolls when transporting products to the city of New York for consumption in such city, subject to an appropriation for the 2021-22 state fiscal year.
Title
Provides that farmers shall receive an exemption from tolls when transporting products to the city of New York for consumption in such city, subject to an appropriation for the 2021-22 state fiscal year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01017 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04679 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S04679 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS