NY A01478 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Title
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02032 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY