NY A01492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lithium batteries of less than 1 inch in diameter and products containing such batteries to be labeled with warnings that swallowing such batteries has been known to cause death.
Title
Requires lithium batteries of less than 1 inch in diameter and products containing such batteries to be labeled with warnings that swallowing such batteries has been known to cause death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.389 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02533 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION