NY A01512 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority to rename President Street subway station the President Street - Medgar Evers College station and rename the Franklin Avenue subway station the Franklin Avenue - Medgar Evers College station.
Title
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority to rename President Street subway station the President Street - Medgar Evers College station and rename the Franklin Avenue subway station the Franklin Avenue - Medgar Evers College station.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.55 |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.669 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a1512a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1681 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3439A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3439a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1512a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03439 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.55