NY A01517 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain borrowing arrangements; relates to the authorization for the contracting of debt; relates to the manner by which payments are appropriated and paid; establishes a fund to reduce debt.
Title
Prohibits certain borrowing arrangements; relates to the authorization for the contracting of debt; relates to the manner by which payments are appropriated and paid; establishes a fund to reduce debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-01-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |