NY A01524 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide restaurant meals program as part of the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Establishes a statewide restaurant meals program as part of the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s64 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.292 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00064 (Same As) 2021-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.430