NY A01527 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to temporary release eligibility for judicially ordered comprehensive alcohol and substance abuse treatment.
Title
Relates to temporary release eligibility for judicially ordered comprehensive alcohol and substance abuse treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.78 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.68 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04324 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION