NY A01541 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain provisions of the general municipal law, relating to granting localities greater contract flexibility and cost savings by permitting certain shared purchasing among political subdivisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain provisions of the general municipal law, relating to granting localities greater contract flexibility and cost savings by permitting certain shared purchasing among political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.211
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.269
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2947A
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.34
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.34
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-24Assemblyprint number 1541b
2018-05-24Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2018-03-28Assemblyprint number 1541a
2018-03-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to local governments
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to local governments
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S02947 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1541B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01541
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01541A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01541B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01541&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1541#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback