NY A01552 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - print number 1552a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - print number 1552a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any: (i) melanoma; or (ii) condition of cancer affecting lymphatic, digestive, hematological, urinary, prostate, neurological, breast and reproductive systems, resulting in total or partial disability or death to a volunteer firefighter, who successfully passed a physical examination on entry into firefighter service, which examination failed to reveal any evidence of such a melanoma or condition, shall be presumptive evidence that it was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty unless the contrary be proven by competent evidence.
Title
Provides that any: (i) melanoma; or (ii) condition of cancer affecting lymphatic, digestive, hematological, urinary, prostate, neurological, breast and reproductive systems, resulting in total or partial disability or death to a volunteer firefighter, who successfully passed a physical examination on entry into firefighter service, which examination failed to reveal any evidence of such a melanoma or condition, shall be presumptive evidence that it was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty unless the contrary be proven by competent evidence.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Steven McLaughlin [R] | Asm. Frank Skartados [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Assembly | print number 1552a |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04936 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 4936B