NY A01564 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a permanent environmental justice advisory group; provides that the function of the group is to ensure that no group of people, including a racial, ethnic, or socioeconomic group, bears a disproportionate share of the negative environmental consequences resulting from industrial, municipal, and commercial operations or the execution of federal, state, local, and tribal programs and policies; empowers that advisory group to adopt a model environmental justice policy applicable to state agencies, and to monitor agencies on compliance with such policies; specifies responsibilities of state agencies; establishes an environmental justice interagency coordinating council.
Title
Creates a permanent environmental justice advisory group; provides that the function of the group is to ensure that no group of people, including a racial, ethnic, or socioeconomic group, bears a disproportionate share of the negative environmental consequences resulting from industrial, municipal, and commercial operations or the execution of federal, state, local, and tribal programs and policies; empowers that advisory group to adopt a model environmental justice policy applicable to state agencies, and to monitor agencies on compliance with such policies; specifies responsibilities of state agencies; establishes an environmental justice interagency coordinating council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.81 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.735 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.325 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a1564 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1677 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2385 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.325 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02385 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.81