NY A01601 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for annual school lead-copper tap water testing; requires the publishing of reports of contamination and abatement of such contamination; requires school districts to provide potable water to school children attending affected schools; exempts those schools built without use of lead piping and those schools where a finding of no contamination has been made for three consecutive years.
Title
Provides for annual school lead-copper tap water testing; requires the publishing of reports of contamination and abatement of such contamination; requires school districts to provide potable water to school children attending affected schools; exempts those schools built without use of lead piping and those schools where a finding of no contamination has been made for three consecutive years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | print number 1601a |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00666 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES